THE LEVICK TRUST

Charity number: 255056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

HOUSING FOR PEOPLE OVER 60 YEARS OLD

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £200
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Middlesbrough

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 March 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Phil Dyson Chair 28 October 2011
None on record
Deborah Edwards Trustee 13 March 2018
None on record
Denise Rooney Trustee 01 March 2015
None on record
Rose Edwards Trustee 11 March 2013
None on record
Cllr Julia Rostron Trustee 01 June 2012
MIDDLESBROUGH ENVIRONMENT CITY TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Ursula Ruth Hicks Trustee 05 January 2012
RECOVERY CONNECTIONS
Received: On time
Refugee Futures Ltd
Received: On time
SOMEWHERE ELSE
Received: On time
THE DURHAM LESOTHO DIOCESAN LINK
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STOCKTON-ON-TEES ST PETER
Received: On time
CHARLES MORRISH Trustee
None on record
COUNCILLOR EDDIE DRYDEN Trustee
None on record
GEORGE SMITH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.26k £3 £5 £5 £200
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 February 2025 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 December 2024 308 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Middlesbrough Borough Council
Fountain Court
119 Grange Road
MIDDLESBROUGH
Cleveland
TS1 2DT
Phone:
01642729558
Website:

No information available