ST JOHN'S HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of Warden assisted housing for those in need, with priority to those living in the districts of Salisbury and Wilton. The Charity maintains 19 units of accommodation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 21 July 1969: Standard registration
- ST JOHN'S HOSPITAL, WILTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raymond Wilson Stedman | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
June Nicola Finlay | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Alison Jean Ward | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Shaun Cowlam CBE | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
RICHARD FAWCUS | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
VIRGINIA ROLFE | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
REVEREND MARK WOOD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.78k | £134.56k | £138.46k | £148.26k | £165.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.28k | £170.62k | £138.89k | £183.59k | £220.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 November 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 November 2023 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 23RD MARCH 1978, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 28 OCTOBER 1996 as amended on 05 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISSIONERS) ARE RESIDENT IN THE DISTRICT OF SALISBURY AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT.
Area of benefit
WILTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 St. John's Square
Wilton
Salisbury
Wiltshire
SP2 0DN
- Phone:
- 01722743421
- Email:
- stjohnswilton@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window