Financial history THE RANDAL CREMER COTTAGES

Charity number: 255151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £49.96k £71.77k £22.94k £25.24k £49.70k
Total expenditure £29.39k £54.37k £32.96k £13.98k £35.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A