TELEPHONES FOR THE BLIND FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The fund exists to help to provide communication devices and services for those who are registered blind or visually impaired and are on low income, enabling many blind and visually impaired people to live independently.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 May 1970: Standard registration
- TELEPHONES FOR THE BLIND FUND-TFTB (Working name)
- TELEPHONES FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Gurth Hughes | Chair | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alison Evans | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Stephen Saunders | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|||||
Daniel David Brookbank | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.20k | £15.13k | £23.97k | £7.25k | £1.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.50k | £23.07k | £56.11k | £11.14k | £451.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 January 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED 18TH JANUARY 1968 AS AMENDED AT SPECIAL GENERAL MEETING HELD ON 11TH MARCH 1969 AND 24TH MARCH 1970 AND 17TH MARCH 1987 AND 29 JULY 1999
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE BLIND AND IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF A) TO PROVIDE TELEPHONES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BLIND RESIDENTS B) TO RAISE FUNDS FOR ABOVE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Arundel Close
Pevensey Bay
Pevensey
BN24 6SF
- Phone:
- 01323765915
- Email:
- info@tftb.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window