Financial history HORBURY CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 255238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.20k £5.74k £3.36k £9.72k £7.12k
Total expenditure £6.60k £6.62k £5.05k £9.86k £4.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.86k N/A N/A N/A N/A