HORBURY CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society aims to encourage high standards of architecture and town planning in the township of Horbury; to stimulate public interest in and care for the beauty, history and character of the town and its surroundings; and to encourage the preservation, development and improvement of features of general public amenity or historic interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 02 April 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM ELLISON ROBERTS | Chair | 26 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen Bickerdike | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Ramsden | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA MARY JERVIS | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah McLauchlan Nicholls | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARK THOMAS WILLIAM BESWICK | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Elizabeth Law | Trustee | 26 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.20k | £5.74k | £3.36k | £9.72k | £7.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.60k | £6.62k | £5.05k | £9.86k | £4.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 FEBRUARY 1968 AS AMENDED 28 JANUARY 1985
Charitable objects
(A) TO ENCOURAGE HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND TOWN PLANNING IN THE TOWNSHIP OF HORBURY. (B TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND CARE FOR THE BEAUTY, HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE AREA OF THE TOWN AND ITS SURROUNDINGS. (C) TO ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY OR HISTORIC INTEREST.
Area of benefit
TOWNSHIP OF HORBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Dovecote Lane
Horbury
Wakefield
WF4 6BG
- Phone:
- 01924374293
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window