W R JOHNSON FOR POOR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
relief of thepoor in the village of Wybunbury
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 12 March 1968: Standard registration
- 09 June 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 09 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 03 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 19TH OCTOBER 1874 (U.V. 36 P.159)
Charitable objects
PURCHASE OF COALS AND CLOTHINGS TO BE DISTRIBUTED IN THE MONTHS OF NOVEMBER, DECEMBER AND JANUARY MONG THE REALLY NECESSITOUS WELL CONDUCTED AND RELIGIOUS POOR WITHOUT REFERENCE TO SECT OR PARY OR RELIGIOUS OR POLITICAL OPINIONS AND BEING CHIEFLY WIDOWS AND AGED MEN AND WOMEN.
Area of benefit
WYBUNBURY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window