THE LAWNS CLUB (MINEHEAD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide facilities for various clubs, the majority of whose members are of pensionable age. These include Dance Exercise, Line Dancing, Tai Chi, Table Tennis, Indoor Bowls. Facilities available for non-members use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 22 January 1969: Standard registration
- THE LAWNS CLUB (Working name)
- MINEHEAD OVER 60'S CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penelope Ann Gibbons | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony John Jones | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Barbara Patricia Parker | Trustee | 23 August 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Geoffrey Maurice Williams | Trustee | 23 August 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Robert Lawrie | Trustee | 23 August 2019 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTINE MARY LAWRENCE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
TERRY JOHN VENNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.88k | £22.39k | £10.85k | £6.14k | £10.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.26k | £7.89k | £16.93k | £7.17k | £8.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.71k | £10.85k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 March 2025 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 May 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 February 2023 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2022 | 286 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30/07/1954 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30/06/1975 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18/04/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE EDUCATION AND PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION AND ANY OBJECTS WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BY LAW BE DEEMED CHARITABLE FOR THE BENEFIT PRINCIPALLY OF THOSE INHABITANTS WHO ARE OF THE AGE OF 60 AND OVER AND ARE RESIDING IN WEST SOMERSET.
Area of benefit
WEST SOMERSET.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Linton
Old Cleeve
MINEHEAD
Somerset
TA24 6HT
- Phone:
- 07771 991735
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window