PONTEFRACT CEREBRAL PALSY SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- City Of Wakefield
- Doncaster
- North Yorkshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 29 April 1970: Standard registration
- 26 September 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PONTEFRACT AND DISTRICT SPASTICS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2004 | 05/04/2005 | 05/04/2006 | 06/04/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.10k | £850 | £92 | £79 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.03k | £940 | £940 | £1.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2007 | 11 March 2008 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | 25 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | 05 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2004 | 12 April 2005 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND FEBRUARY 1968 AS AMENDED ON 21 OCTOBER 1994.
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE TREATMENT, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND WELFARE OF SPASTICS. B) TO MAKE GRANTS OR DONATIONS TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SPASTICS WHO ARE IN NEEDY CIRCUMSTANCES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
PONTEFRACT AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window