Accounts and annual returns SCALBY VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 255439
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 November 2024 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 November 2023 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 December 2022 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 December 2022 38 days late
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 March 2022 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 March 2022 499 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required