LEEDS THEATRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates a theatre complex and arts centre. As well as producing the artistic programme onstage, it offers a range of participatory arts and educational activities to people of all ages and backgrounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£10,481,345
Donations and legacies | £879.31k | |
Charitable activities | £8.54m | |
Other trading activities | £1.00m | |
Investments | £55.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£12,429,752
Raising funds | £225.93k | |
Charitable activities | £9.95m | |
Other | £2.26m |
£6,979 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £2,041,507 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.48m | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.95m |
People

112 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 26 March 1968: Standard registration
- 07 July 2014: Funds received from 514896 FRIENDS OF THE PLAYHOUSE
- WEST YORKSHIRE PLAYHOUSE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fatima Salaria | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gruen | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Samantha Louise Fray | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Eddison | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bertille Calinaud | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Kevin Brophy | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Robinson | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Rozina Breen | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Pitt | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Alan Nabarro | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.88m | £8.31m | £9.15m | £7.27m | £10.48m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.61m | £8.43m | £3.69m | £8.14m | £12.43m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.10m | £2.80m | £5.05m | £3.13m | £2.04m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.23m | £1.01m | £2.62m | £932.62k | £879.31k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £228.87k | £588.92k | £58.64k | £475.09k | £1.00m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.36m | £6.04m | £5.65m | £5.75m | £8.54m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £57.57k | £57.61k | £55.29k | £56.46k | £55.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £621.45k | £760.54k | £50.40k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £8.13m | £7.69m | £3.12m | £7.43m | £9.95m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £470.79k | £741.79k | £567.73k | £708.74k | £225.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £10.65k | £40.38k | £16.39k | £13.03k | £30.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.26m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.43m | £6.28m | £6.17m | £5.80m | £5.46m | |
|
Long-term investments | £635.64k | £586.21k | £680.25k | £660.74k | £667.71k | |
|
Other assets | £3.52m | £4.47m | £6.55m | £6.25m | £5.20m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £5.36m | £6.29m | £2.81m | £2.89m | £3.56m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 01 September 2020 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 01 September 2020 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/02/1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/09/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/07/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/09/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/02/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/06/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/05/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/10/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19/03/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AND ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TO RAISE THE ARTISTIC TASTE OF THE COUNTY AND TO PROMOTE ENCOURAGE AND INCREASE THE APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE ARTS GENERALLY AND DRAMATIC ART VISUAL ART AND LITERARY ART IN PARTICULAR.
Area of benefit
CITY OF LEEDS AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEEDS PLAYHOUSE
PLAYHOUSE SQUARE
LEEDS
LS2 7UP
- Phone:
- 01132137800
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window