WOKING ASSOCIATION OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides support, representation and advice to voluntary and community organisations and enables areas of unmet need to be covered. Delivers volunteer centre services to national standards. Services for voluntary and community groups include payroll, HR, Funding advice and finance. Provides interpreting and translation services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Total income includes £168,411 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 08 May 1968: Standard registration
- 10 May 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- WAVS (Working name)
- WOKING COUNCIL OF SOCIAL SERVICE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £263.01k | £293.34k | £235.62k | £270.34k | £267.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £271.49k | £271.21k | £287.60k | £259.32k | £278.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £134.24k | £166.33k | £168.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 08 February 2018 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
08 February 2018 | 8 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 27 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 27 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 11 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2015
(These accounts |
11 January 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MARCH 1968 AS AMENDED 27 JUNE 1973, 26 JULY 1989, 17 SEPTEMBER 1997, 30 SEPTEMBER 1998, 1 OCTOBER 2003 3 OCTOBER 2006, AND 15 OCTOBER 2007.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE BOROUGH OF WOKING AND ELSEWHERE IN SURREY AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF WOKING AND ELSEWHERE IN THE COUNTY OF SURREY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window