THE MARDEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Protestant and Evangelical tenets of the Christian Faith in the United Kingdom or overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 06 May 1968: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID NEWMAN GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LUCIA WHEALY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIAN NEWMAN GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.88k | £7.15k | £4.86k | £3.54k | £3.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £9.25k | £2.30k | £6.82k | £342 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DARTED 1ST MARCH 1968
Charitable objects
THE SUPPORT OF ANY RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR WORK ESTABLISHED OR MAINTAINED FOR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES:-(I) THE FURTHERANCE OF RELIGIOUS OR SECULAR EDUCATION; (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE PROTESTANT AND EVANGELICAL TENETS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH EITHER IN THE UK OR OVERSEAS; (III) THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF MISSIONARY ACTIVITIES;(IV) THE RILIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY; (V) THE HELP AND COMFORT OF THE SICK ANDAGED.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Weighbridge Court
301 High Street
ONGAR
Essex
CM5 9FD
- Phone:
- 07956685260
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window