Financial history BIRMINGHAM HEALTH SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 255523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £43.50k £53.61k £44.90k £48.27k £69.17k
Total expenditure £33.84k £39.74k £38.43k £48.19k £57.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A