BIRMINGHAM HEALTH SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main purpose is to help employers reduce accidents in the work place by promoting standards of health and safety in the workplace. BHSEA provides a health and safety advisory and support service to it's Members and opportunities for networking and learning. Our focus is on smaller and medium size organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Shropshire
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 04 June 1968: Standard registration
- B H S E A (Working name)
- BIRMINGHAM AND DISTRICT INDUSTRIAL SAFETY GROUP LIMITED (Previous name)
- BIRMINGHAM HEALTH AND SAFETY ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Rollinson | Trustee | 08 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marisa Firkins | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clark Richardson-Hunter | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Ley | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Prophett | Trustee | 18 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN MARK ROLINSON | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
DALVINDER MASAUN | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.50k | £53.61k | £44.90k | £48.27k | £69.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.84k | £39.74k | £38.43k | £48.19k | £57.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 August 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/11/1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/02/1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/04/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/01/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/06/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 JUL 2016 as amended on 11 Jan 2021 as amended on 11 Jan 2021 as amended on 28 Apr 2022 as amended on 08 Apr 2024 as amended on 08 Apr 2024 as amended on 22 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION'S OBJECTIVE IS TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH, SAFETY, WELFARE AND WELLBEING OF WORKING PEOPLE AND THE ORGANISATIONS THEY WORK FOR BY FACILITATING NETWORKING, SHARING, LEARNING, THE ADOPTION OF GOOD PRACTICE AND CONTINUOUS IMPROVEMENT. THIS EXTENDS TO AN ORGANISATION'S PHYSICAL ASSETS, THE ENVIRONMENT, AND THE COMMUNITY WHICH IT SERVES OR IN WHICH IT OPERATES WITH A FOCUS ON BIRMINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDON AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
BHSEA (Nicklin LLP)
Church Court
Stourbridge Road
Halesowen
West Midlands
B63 3TT
- Phone:
- 07881290238
- Email:
- secretary@bhsea.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window