HARTISMERE HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising. Sponsoring the supply of equipment for use in physiotherapy, midwifery and care in the community. Funding projects in restructured hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 20 January 1969: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Muriel Diamond | Chair | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fre Brown | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Allison Nailard | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MISS RUTH LANGLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BEVERLEY JEAN GODDARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STELLA ROSEMARY GODDARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.57k | £943 | £1.32k | £2.70k | £4.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.10k | £1.41k | £1.12k | £879 | £2.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST OCTOBER 1968
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HARTISMERE HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK CONVALESCENT DISABLED HANDICAPPED INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
HARTISMERE R.D.
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 Millfield
Castleton Way
EYE
Suffolk
IP23 7DE
- Phone:
- 07485184198
- Email:
- allisonnailard@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window