CHAPEL TRUST MARYTON CARMEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advances religion and the relief of poverty and also such other charitable purposes connected with the Roman Catholic religion by way of providing grants and the service of a public chapel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- Wirral
Governance
- CARMELITE MONASTERY UP HOLLAND CHAPEL TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SISTER ROSEMARY PATRICIA DOHENY | Chair | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
sister Gabrielle Scott | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SISTER MARY TERESA MORGAN | Trustee | 06 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
SISTER PATRICIA ANNE LOVAT | Trustee | 05 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.44k | £8.98k | £5.64k | £4.44k | £5.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.01k | £87.75k | £52.34k | £43.25k | £29.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29/03/1968 AS AMENDED ON 23/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 06/01/2015
Charitable objects
CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE PUBLIC CHAPEL AT THE CARMELITE MONASTERY MARYTON GRANGE ALLERTON ROAD LIVERPOOL INCLUDING THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND ALSO SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
1. NATIONAL 2. LIVERPOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carmelite Monastery
28 Maryton Grange
Allerton
Liverpool
L18 3NU
- Phone:
- 01517244772
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window