Financial history HENRY HOARE'S CHARITY FOR DISTRIBUTION OF BIBLES AND RELIGIOUS BOOKS
Charity number: 255689

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.74k | £1.30k | £1.34k | £1.59k | £1.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.55k | £400 | £1.97k | £1.61k | £1.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.