ST JOHN AMBULANCE ASSOCIATION, NELSON CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold property and permit it to be used by St John ambulance for training and fund raising and for teaching of first aid and kindred subjects. When available the rooms may be booked at a charge by other groups for coffee mornings etc. The trustees are in control of the upkeep of the building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 26 July 1968: Standard registration
- NELSON AMBULANCE BUILDING FUND (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA DUXBURY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Raymond John Patrick Condon | Trustee | 10 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Tyhurst | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN LEVY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RONALD WHALLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMAN MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN LEIGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.40k | £5.91k | £5.85k | £5.42k | £6.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.36k | £5.44k | £5.20k | £4.78k | £4.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 557 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 557 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 922 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 922 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1287 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1287 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1652 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1652 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED OF THE 31ST OCTOBER, 1900
Charitable objects
FOR USE AS A DRILL HALL, LECTURE HALL, CLASS ROOMS, READING ROOMS AND RECREATION ROOMS AND ALL THINGS NECESSARY OR APPERTAINING THERETO FOR THE PROMOTION ADVANCEMENT AND OBTAINING INSTRUCTION AND KNOWLEDGE IN AMBULANCE WORK AS NOW GIVEN OR CARRIED OUT BY THE ST. JOHNS AMBULANCE ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NELSON
Contact information
- Address:
-
184 REGENT STREET
NELSON
BB9 8SQ
- Phone:
- 01282603647
- Email:
- condon3333333@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window