ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NOTTINGHAM AND NOTTS BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides financial assistance for stray animals treatments. Provides accomodation for homeless animals. Provides rehoming facilities. Offers assistance to general public in need of help with animal neutering. Welfare Advice available
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 16 May 1968: Standard registration
- RSPCA NOTTINGHAM (Working name)
- RSPCA NOTTINGHAM AND NOTTS BRANCH (Working name)
- RSPCA NOTTINGHAM AND NOTTS BRANCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kerry Ann Grinrod | Chair | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Emma Cook | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Daniela Twardawa | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise BALL | Trustee | 11 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Susan Louise Ellis | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £232.26k | £286.35k | £349.05k | £143.73k | £325.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £528.27k | £377.44k | £323.76k | £433.88k | £382.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £62.90k | £54.84k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
CITY OF NOTTINGHAM AND SOUTHERN PART OF COUNTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kemp-McAdam Building
7 Farrington Way
Eastwood
Nottingham
Nottinghamshire
NG16 3BF
- Phone:
- 0115784110
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window