Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NOTTINGHAM AND NOTTS BRANCH

Charity number: 255763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kerry Ann Grinrod Chair 16 September 2015
None on record
Lucy Emma Cook Trustee 15 January 2020
None on record
Melanie Daniela Twardawa Trustee 16 January 2018
None on record
Emma Louise BALL Trustee 11 March 2013
None on record
Susan Louise Ellis Trustee 16 August 2012
None on record