ST BRANNOCK'S PARISH ROOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities associated with St Brannocks Church. Use by the wider community for various activities requiring modern indoor rooms with a near commercial kitchen.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 24 May 1968: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jillian Margaret Cottingham | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Rose Squance Mrs | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Peter Baker | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Timothy John Bishop | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.78k | £2.68k | £761 | £3.99k | £5.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.21k | £3.94k | £3.06k | £4.35k | £6.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 7/10/1902 AND SCHEME OF 7/05/1937
Charitable objects
LAND AND PROPERTY TO BE USED: 1. AS A SUNDAY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS OR CHILDREN ONLY OF THE LABOURING MANUFACTURING AND OTHER POORER CLASSES IN THE PARISH OF BRAUNTON ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. 2. FOR THE CELEBRATION OF DIVINE SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RITES AND CEREMONIES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AS BY LAW ESTABLISHED. 3. AS A RESIDENCE OR RESIDENCES FOR A TEACHER OR TEACHERS OF THE SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1-6 OF INDENTURE)
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BRAUNTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Vicarage
Church Street
Devon
BRAUNTON
Devon
EX33 2EL
- Phone:
- 01271815330
- Email:
- davidbaker.sw@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window