Accounts and annual returns STROUD FESTIVAL LIMITED

Charity number: 255857
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 September 2017 On Time