THE FRIENDS OF BROOKLANDS SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Brooklands School (from now on known as FOBS) charity aims are to raised funds to enhance the curriculum and provide opportunities above the curriculum for the children of Brooklands School, all of whom have severe, profound or complex learning difficulties, including autism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 03 October 1969: Standard registration
- F O B S (Working name)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ELLEN TERRY AND BROOKLANDS HOSPITALS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Joseph Woodley Phillips | Chair | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicolette Ann Long | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chrisna Staquet | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Leigh Price | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Morgan | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.14k | £22.10k | £24.57k | £25.12k | £22.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.29k | £8.03k | £29.05k | £20.51k | £35.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST JULY 1969, AS AMENDED 30TH APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE PUPILS ATTENDING BROOKLANDS SCHOOL WHO HAVE A LEARNING DIFFICULTY (2) TO RELIEVE THE SAME WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED (3) TO ASSIST IN THE EDUCATION OF THE SAME THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SPECIAL BENEFITS NOT PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY OR OTHER PUBLIC BODY
Area of benefit
REIGATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brooklands School
27 Wray Park Road
REIGATE
RH2 0DF
- Phone:
- 01737249941
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window