ST ANDREWS CHAPEL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 22 May 1968: Standard registration
- 12 September 2001: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DONCASTER - ST GEORGE MARSHGATE VESTRY SALE FUND (Working name)
- SCHOOL ROOM, MEETING HOUSE OR LECTURE ROOM (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCES DATED 11/01/1866 AND 31/12/1887 AS AMENDED ON 23 SEPTEMBER 1998 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
A SCHOLL ROOM, MEETING HOUSE OR LECTURE ROOM TO BE USED BY THE VICAR OF DONCASTER AND HIS SUCCESSORS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF DONCASTER AS A PLACE OF EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN, OR AS APLACE OF PUBLIC INSTRUCTION AND WORSHIP ACCORDING TO THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DONCASTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.