THE HOSPITAL OF REVEREND WILLIAM JAMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Accommodation and Housing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 August 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard John Shepherd | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|||||||
Addison Lloyd | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Julie Dawn Bousfield | Trustee | 23 February 2016 |
|
|||||||
RUTH EDWARDS | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|||||||
GEOFFREY ANDREW LIDDLE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.75k | £71.68k | £152.31k | £78.78k | £100.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.87k | £76.06k | £60.21k | £114.49k | £79.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 77 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 77 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 336 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 336 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 30 November 2023 | 275 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 30 November 2023 | 275 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 08 APR 1975 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27 MAY 1987 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08 OCT 1990
Charitable objects
THE ALMSPEOPLE SHALL BE NEEDY PERSONS WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS) ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF CAWOOD AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CAWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Elmhirst Parker LLP
The Cross
Kirkgate
Sherburn in Elmet
Leeds
LS25 6BH
- Phone:
- 01757703895
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window