THE FORDINGBRIDGE NURSING AIDS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trustees of this local Charity have spent time looking at the objectives and scope of the Trust, in order to bring it up to date, and expand the usage. Certain criteria have to be agreed by the Charity Commission, and provided these are acceptable, we will embark on a new Publicity campaign.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Dorset
- Hampshire
Governance
- 11 March 1971: Standard registration
- 07 March 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE FORDINGBRIDGE NURSING AND SICKNESS CHARITY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.46k | £971 | £3.62k | £8.00k | £9.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.98k | £1.53k | £2.35k | £4.61k | £3.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 08 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 13 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 14 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 17 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 26TH JANUARY 1971 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 9 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVING IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS RESIDENT IN FORDINGBRIDGE WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM BY PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES WHICH ARE CALCULATED TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING OR ASSIST THE RECOVERY OF SUCH PERSONS IN SUCH CASES BUT ARE NOT READILY AVAILABLE TO THEM FROM OTHER SOURCES.
Area of benefit
FORDINGBRIDGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window