Financial history TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNEXION WITH ST MARY'S CHURCH HUSBANDS BOSWORTH

Charity Number: 255896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £5.54k £3.00k £3.92k £1.59k £6.93k
Total expenditure £6.27k £5.61k £2.06k £7.21k £8.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A