Accounts and annual returns VICTORIA HOMES

Charity number: 255927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 18 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 07 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 07 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 16 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 16 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 17 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 17 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window