VICTORIA HOMES

Charity Number: 255927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Almshouses for elderly people

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £107,256
Total expenditure: £98,992

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hartlepool

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 May 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • VICTORIA & JUBILEE HOMES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew John Henderson Trustee 10 February 2022
None on record
stephen Allison Trustee 01 June 2021
None on record
ADRIAN LIDDELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £59.72k £63.03k £67.93k £75.17k £107.26k
Total expenditure £98.37k £67.96k £93.34k £114.45k £98.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 18 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 07 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 07 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 16 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 16 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 17 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 17 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 14 MARCH 1972
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE WHO SHALL BE POOR AGED PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR NOT LESS THAN 20 YEARS.
Area of benefit
COUNTY BOROUGH OF HARTLEPOOL
Registration history
  • 20 May 1968 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
10-11 Church Street
HARTLEPOOL
Cleveland
TS24 7DJ
Phone:
01429223334
Website:

No information available