Financial history THE ROUND TABLE TRUST (DEED 1962)

Charity Number: 255994
Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £5.18k £6.79k £3.98k £5.44k £5.01k
Total expenditure £1.58k £2.56k £382 £345 £345
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A