THE ROUND TABLE TRUST (DEED 1962)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To collect and receive monies to apply the Fund for the objects of the Fund which are to further and promote Inquiry and Research into the study of the systems of Law and Legal and Social problems to promote education and knowledge in these matters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 June 1968: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVE BARKER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SAMANTHA FINCHAM | Trustee | 23 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEVE LORD | Trustee | 23 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY BOOTH | Trustee | 11 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARK NEWBY | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANDREW JAMES HORNBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.18k | £6.79k | £3.98k | £5.44k | £5.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.58k | £2.56k | £382 | £345 | £345 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 182 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2ND NOVEMBER 1962
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER AND PROMOTE INQUIRY AND RESEARCH INTO THE STUDY OF THE FOLLOWING MATTERS AND THE IMPARTING TO OTHERS AND DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS AND GENERALLY TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN KNOWLEDGE IN THE FIELDS OF THE HISTORY OF AQUISITION OF TERRITORIES, CONSTITUTIONAL AND OTHER BRANCHES OF LAW AND SOCIAL PROBLEMS. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE DEED).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marchesi House
4 Embassy Drive
Edgbaston
BIRMINGHAM
B15 1TP
- Phone:
- 01214564402
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window