Accounts and annual returns L G HARRIS AND COMPANY LIMITED - CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 256049
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2016 19 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2015 18 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2014 15 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not Required