AUGUSTINIAN SISTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Convent and Guest accommodation & retreats. Pastoral and social work/support where and when required Provision of financial support for the missions of the Congregation overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lambeth
- Brazil
- Malta
- Philippines
Governance
- 24 June 1968: Standard registration
- THE ENGLISH PROVINCE OF THE AUGUSTINIAN SISTERS, SERVANTS OF JESUS AND MARY (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sister Maria Victoria Saliba | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rita Mangion | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Ann Frendo | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
SISTER MARIA BUHAGIAR | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.22k | £81.43k | £122.58k | £265.86k | £185.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £317.48k | £84.86k | £124.09k | £556.38k | £279.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21ST MAY 1968 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 1ST JULY 1997 as amended on 10 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON IN ENGLAND OR WALES BY OR UNDER THE DIRECTION OF THE SOCIETY AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE SUPERIOR SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND OR WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
AUGUSTINIAN SISTERS
ST. MONICA HOUSE
83 CLAPHAM ROAD
LONDON
SW9 0HY
- Phone:
- 02075820840
- Email:
- stmonicahouse@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window