Trustees SOCIETY FOR RESEARCH INTO HYDROCEPHALUS AND SPINA BIFIDA
Charity number: 256115
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof John Pickard CBE | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Singleton PhD FRCS | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andy Wynd MBE MIoD | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jo Glazier | Trustee | 26 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Prof Pat McAllister | Trustee | 26 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN POPLE MD FRCS | Trustee | 01 June 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.