THE BOOKMAKERS EMPLOYEES BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist aged and infirm ex Racecourse Bookmakers Employees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 July 1968: Standard registration
- 09 October 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE ARCHIE SCOTT BENEVOLENT FUND (SOUTHERN) FOR BOOKMAKERS EMPLOYEES (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | 30/04/2016 | 30/04/2017 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | 08 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | 19 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST MAY 1968
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF ANY EMPLOYEE OR EX-EMPLOYEE RESIDING IN THE SOUTH ENGLAND OR ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF ANY BOOKMAKER WHO THROUGH SICKNESS, OLD AGE, ACCIDENT OR FOR OTHER SIMILAR CAUSE ARE UNABLE TO SUPPRT THEMSELVES THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS AND THE WIDOWS AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OF ANY DECEASED EMPLOYEE OR EX-EMPLOYEE OF ANY-BOOKMAKER IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window