STANLEY GEORGE CROFT FOR ORGANIST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity provides funding towards paying an organist for St James Church Riddlesdown.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Croydon
Governance
- 23 September 1968: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222 | £82 | £352 | £163 | |
|
Total expenditure | £179 | £82 | £85 | £92 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 18 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT THE PRINCIPAL PROBATE REGISTRY ON 20/15/1946 AND SCHEME OF 4/10/1983
Charitable objects
TOWARDS THE SALARY OF AN ORGANIST FOR ST JAMES CHURCH RIDDLESDOWN.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, RIDDLESDOWN.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window