Financial history GRANTHAM DRAMATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 256227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £19.25k £4.84k £21.57k £18.28k £20.34k
Total expenditure £18.54k £3.77k £13.87k £17.46k £30.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £11.18k £1.66k N/A