Financial history NORTH WEST SURREY SYNAGOGUE

Charity number: 256232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £301.40k £293.99k £273.05k £273.05k £316.54k
Total expenditure £285.61k £335.44k £294.33k £307.19k £373.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A