NORTH WEST SURREY SYNAGOGUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Synagogue for the purpose of public worship and of advancing religious, educational and charitable activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 July 1968: Standard registration
- N W S S (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leslie Asher | Chair | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Goldenberg | Trustee | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ben Snapper | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Jankel | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Sheppard | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sawyer | Trustee | 27 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £301.40k | £293.99k | £273.05k | £273.05k | £316.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £285.61k | £335.44k | £294.33k | £307.19k | £373.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 184 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LAWS ADOPTED 25 JANUARY 1968 AS AMENDED BY CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 OCTOBER 2006 AS AMENDED 3 FEBRUARY 2008 AND 23 NOVEMBER 2014 as amended on 05 Oct 2021 as amended on 05 Oct 2021 as amended on 05 Oct 2021 as amended on 05 Oct 2021 as amended on 04 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A PLACE OF PUBLIC WORSHIP FOR JEWS AND OF ADVANCING RELIGIOUS, EDUCATIONAL AND CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
North West Surrey Synagogue
Rosslyn Park
WEYBRIDGE
KT13 9QZ
- Phone:
- 01932855400
- Email:
- admin@nwss.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window