Governing document NORTH WEST SURREY SYNAGOGUE
Charity number: 256232

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LAWS ADOPTED 25 JANUARY 1968 AS AMENDED BY CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 OCTOBER 2006 AS AMENDED 3 FEBRUARY 2008 AND 23 NOVEMBER 2014 as amended on 05 Oct 2021 as amended on 05 Oct 2021 as amended on 05 Oct 2021 as amended on 05 Oct 2021 as amended on 04 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A PLACE OF PUBLIC WORSHIP FOR JEWS AND OF ADVANCING RELIGIOUS, EDUCATIONAL AND CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.