BAINTON POOR'S ESTATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of Poverty Elderly/Old People Provides buildings/facilities/open space
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 04 July 1968: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Elizabeth Lucas | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Joanna Lucy Durrands | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Mance | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WREFORD | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL CLOUGH | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN JAMES ABBOTT-DONNELLY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.02k | £108.70k | £11.07k | £4.06k | £4.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.31k | £105.09k | £19.12k | £4.96k | £5.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.19k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 26TH OCTOBER 1954
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY OUT OF THE INCOME A YEARLY SUM NOT EXCEEDING $60 OR SUCH SUM AS THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS APPROVE FROM TIME TO TIME TOWARDS DEFRAYING THE COST OF MAINTAINING AND REPAIRING THE READING ROOM - SUBJECT TO SAME, TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE YEARLY INCOME FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF BAINTON AS IN CLAUSE 30 OF SCHEME.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BAINTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 BROAD STREET
STAMFORD
LINCOLNSHIRE
PE9 1PY
- Phone:
- 01780764145
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window