THE BLUES AND ROYALS OLIVER MONTAGU FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To give assistance to families and children of those that have served in any of the regiments that now comprise of The Blues and Royals. The Trust was entirely separate from the Association and that it also incorporated assistance to serving officers and other ranks, if this was found necessary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Germany
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Spain
Governance
- 22 January 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LT COLONEL PADDY WILLIAMS MC | Chair | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS DENIS EDWARD Mountain | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
LT COLONEL JIM ERYE | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.13k | £26.27k | £15.15k | £800 | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.86k | £7.12k | £8.13k | £5.69k | £7.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 22 JANUARY 1970
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE USED FOR ASSISTING SERVING OFFICERS, WARRANT OFFICERS, NON-COMMISSIONED OFFICERS AND TROOPERS OF THE BLUES AND ROYALS (ROYAL HORSE GUARDS AND 1ST DRAGOONS) AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE AND FORMER OFFICERS, WARRANT OFFICERS, NON-COMMISSIONED OFFICERS AND TROOPERS OF THE FORMER ROYAL HORSE GUARDS (THE BLUES) THE FORMER ROYAL DRAGOONS (1ST DRAGOONS) OR THE BLUES AND ROYALS (ROYAL HORSE GUARDS AND 1ST DRAGOONS) AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 North Close
Windsor
SL4 5ND
- Phone:
- 07881625124
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window