DESIGNABILITY CHARITY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Designability Charity Limited is a design and development charity working in the fields of medicine, health care and assistive technology for disabled people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,930,799
Donations and legacies | £1.66m | |
Charitable activities | £225.65k | |
Other trading activities | £6.72k | |
Investments | £33.87k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,238,053
Raising funds | £152.40k | |
Charitable activities | £1.74m | |
Other | £349.31k |
£44,041 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £501.71k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.74m |
People

33 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 July 1968: Standard registration
- B I M E (Working name)
- DESIGNABILITY (Working name)
- BATH INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL ENGINEERING LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Marwood | Chair | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Louise McKee | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicola Jane Wilson | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Joseph Ward | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julian Massie | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Chatzimichali | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Monk | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Sarah Skeet | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Bailey | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel James Whatley | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Benjamin William Metcalfe | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Fairhurst | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Emma Kate Legg | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.83m | £1.93m | £2.19m | £2.54m | £1.93m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.53m | £1.70m | £2.08m | £2.19m | £2.24m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.32m | £1.56m | £1.86m | £2.03m | £1.66m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £58.90k | £593 | £5.17k | £6.47k | £6.72k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £436.19k | £354.36k | £312.90k | £481.51k | £225.65k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £14.57k | £14.47k | £11.54k | £20.21k | £33.87k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £13.19k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.29m | £1.50m | £1.69m | £1.79m | £1.74m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £111.73k | £30.61k | £81.18k | £110.39k | £152.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £4.33k | £11.84k | £882 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £122.61k | £165.89k | £310.77k | £295.67k | £349.31k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £293.47k | £180.47k | £157.84k | £156.40k | £116.38k | |
|
Long-term investments | £493.93k | £586.71k | £615.43k | £588.32k | £782.36k | |
|
Other assets | £957.91k | £1.31m | £1.77m | £1.87m | £1.46m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £153.53k | £157.64k | £486.63k | £229.33k | £234.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 JUN 1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 FEB 1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31 MAY 1975 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 OCT 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 MAR 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06 JUN 2017 as amended on 18 Nov 2019 as amended on 18 Nov 2019 as amended on 08 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE INSTITUTE ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL EDUCATION AND OF ENGINEERING RESEARCH FOR MEDICAL PURPOSES, THE DISSEMINATION OF THE KNOWLEDGE THEREBY ACQUIRED AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED (BY REASON OF THEIR DISABILITY, AGE OR INFIRMITY) BY THE PROVISION OF DEVICES AND EQUIPMENT TO ASSIST IN THEIR MEDICAL TREATMENT OR IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
D1
Wolfson Centre
Royal United Hospital
BATH
- Phone:
- 01225824103
- Email:
- info@designability.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window