THE HILDERSHAM CHURCH TRUST FOR THE RECTOR AND OTHER ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General repair of church fabric including Church organ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 22 July 1968: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH DAY | Chair | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Palmer | Trustee | 29 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Melloy | Trustee | 29 August 2022 |
|
|||||
John Mervyn Wingfield | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £307 | £323 | £320 | £334 | £317 | |
|
Total expenditure | £305 | £324 | £323 | £334 | £317 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 6 FEBRUARY 1961
Charitable objects
(1)TO PAY A YEARLY SUM TO THE SEXTON FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF HILDERSHAM SO LONG AS HE SHALL KEEP THE CHURCHYARD IN GOOD AND NEAT ORDER. (2) THE RESIDUE OF THE INCOME TO BE PAID IN OR TOWARDS DEFRAYING THE COST OF MAINTAINING AND REPAIRING THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH, AND THE ORGAN, FURNITURE AND FIXTURES THEREIN. THE RESIDUE OF THE INCOME TO BE PAID TO THE RECTOR OF HILDERSHAM. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 18 OF THE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HILDERSHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
FOUR WINDS
LINTON ROAD
HILDERSHAM
CAMBRIDGE
CB21 6BS
- Phone:
- 01223891527
- Email:
- keithdday@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window