PENDOCK CHURCH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of the poor and maintenance of the church fabric
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 19 July 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Ian Davies | Trustee | 14 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Liza Marie Christmas | Trustee | 14 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Beatrice Coates | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Douglas John Braund | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin James Palmer Knott | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
REV Julie James B Ed | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH RAMBRIDGE | Trustee | 13 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.70k | £3.87k | £5.03k | £6.54k | £8.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.99k | £2.11k | £5.28k | £3.81k | £1.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
(REP. VOL. 23 P.629) AS AMENDED ON 10 JANUARY 1994 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 43(2)(C) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1992
Charitable objects
INCOME MAY BE USED TO REPAIR AND MAINTAIN THE CHURCH OF THE REDEEMER AT PENDOCK CROSS PROVIDING SUCH INCOME IS NOT REQUIRED FOR THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF PENDOCK OR THE MAINTENANCE OF PENDOCK CHURCH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF PENDOCK AND PENDOCK CROSS
Contact information
- Address:
-
TUDOR HOUSE
FISHERS PLACE
PENDOCK
GLOUCESTER
GL19 3PR
- Phone:
- 01684830099
- Email:
- dougbraund@fishersplace.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window