Accounts and annual returns PAMELA MILTON PAUL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 256419
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2011 08 February 2012 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2010 27 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2009 07 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2008 11 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not Required