Financial history PAMELA MILTON PAUL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 256419
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2007 05/04/2008 05/04/2009 05/04/2010 05/04/2011
Total gross income £8.55k £9.36k £7.04k £5.27k £7.94k
Total expenditure £11.23k £13.63k £4.45k £13.05k £7.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A