NEWARK (NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND LINCOLNSHIRE) AIR MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and display of aircraft and aviation artefacts, with a particular emphasis on training and post-war airframes for the benefit of the public and future generations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 12 September 1968: Standard registration
- NEWARK (NOTTS & LINCS) AIR MUSEUM (Working name)
- NEWARK AIR MUSEUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip John Wardell | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel John Maxwell | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Emily Hazle | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angus Clark | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Graham | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Edward Rice | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Colin Savill | Trustee | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD FRANK HEELEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN HIBBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £384.41k | £250.41k | £317.81k | £397.19k | £433.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £407.99k | £336.09k | £359.34k | £431.20k | £432.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.93k | £67.81k | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 APRIL 1968 AS AMENDED 15 OCTOBER 1991 AND 30 MAY 1997.
Charitable objects
(1) TO PRESERVE, RESTORE, MAINTAIN AND DISPLAY BOTH HISTORICAL AND PRESENT DAY AIRCRAFT FOR THE DENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC INTERESTED IN AVIATION AND TO PROMOTE THE FURTHERANCE OF INTEREST IN WORLD AIRCRAFT. (2) TO PROMOTE OR JOIN IN PROMOTING RESEARCH WORK IN CONNECTION WITH THE HISTORY OF AVIATION AND TO PAY OR CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS THE EXPENSES OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH WORK. (3) TO RECORD AVIATION HISTORY AS IT OCCURS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Newark Air Museum
The Airfield
Lincoln Road
Winthorpe
NEWARK
NG24 2NY
- Phone:
- 01636707170
- Email:
- enquire@newarkairmuseum.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window