THE SINGLE SOLDIERS DEPENDANTS FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 31 July 1968: Standard registration
- 22 September 1997: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 22 September 1997: Funds transferred to 1064522 THE ARMY DEPENDANTS' TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED OF THE 11TH JULY 1968, SCHEMES OF THE 11TH OCTOBER 1976 AND 12TH OCTOBER 1981 AND 4TH SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF HER MAJESTY'S ARMY BY PROVIDING A SUM OF MONEY FOR THE IMMEDIATE NEEDS OF THE DEPENDANTS OF SUBSCRIBERS TO THE FUND WHO DIE WHILE SERVING ON A REGULAR ARMY ENGAGEMENT AND TO ALLIEVIATE THE DISTRESS OF SUCH DEPENDANTS WHO MUST BE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.